+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Giddens, and R. Smith.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Giddens.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from House.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1095 to H-1092 filed, withdrawn.
- Amendment H-1091 adopted.
- Amendment H-1090 adopted.
- Amendment H-1094 to H-1092 filed, withdrawn.
- Withdrawn.
- Point of order raised on H-1092, ruled not germane.
- Motion to suspend rules failed.
- Passed House, yeas 54, nays 44.
- Immediate message.
- Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1092.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Amendments H-1090, H-1091 and H-1092 filed.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
- Subcommittee: (Committee of The Whole) Bossman, Brown-Powers, Carlson, Forbes, Gaskill, Hein, Hite, Holt, Huseman, Isenhart, Jacoby, James, Jones, Kaufmann, Kurth, Kurtz, Maxwell, McConkey, Nielsen, Osmundson, Sieck, Wheeler, Windschitl, Wolfe and Zumbach.
- Committee report, recommending passage.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1072 filed.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Amendments H-1034 and H-1035 filed.
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Deyoe, Brink and Ehlert.