+ − Transition
HSB176 is now HF682
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (34)
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 86, nays none.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1427.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-1427 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
- Amendments S-3116 and S-3150 adopted.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3150 filed.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Amendment S-3116 filed.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/31/2021 2:00PM RM 111.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: R. Smith, Boulton, and Cournoyer.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Passed House, yeas 97, nays none.
- Amendment H-1147 adopted.
- Immediate message.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1147 filed.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 682.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2021 12:30PM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Nordman, Deyoe and McConkey.
- Introduced, referred to Commerce.