+ − Transition
HSB170 is now HF623
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sweeney, Kinney, and Shipley.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from House.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 91, nays 2.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 623.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2021 8:30AM House Lounge.
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2021 1:00PM House Lounge (Cancelled).
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Cisneros, Maxwell and Staed.
- Subcommittee: Cisneros, Maxwell and Nielsen.
- Introduced, referred to Local Government.