+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 944.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 922.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 922.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 833.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 817.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 817.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 776.
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, McCoy, Anderson, and Mathis. S.J. 692.
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 667.
- Message from House. S.J. 667.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 685.
- Passed House, ayes 96, nays none. H.J. 681.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 445.
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Commerce.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Watts Chair,Dawson, and Smith, J..
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor