+ − Transition
HF167 is now HF795
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Sinclair, Rozenboom, and Trone Garriott.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Education.
- Message from House.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 91, nays 1.
- Withdrawn.
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 795.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 1:30PM House Lounge 1.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Sorensen, Donahue and Salmon.
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 2:00PM RM 24A.
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Sweeney, and Trone Garriott.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Education.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor