+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SF 475 substituted.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 95 nays 2.
- Substituted for HF 736.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1106 filed.
- Read first time, passed on file.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3082 adopted, as amended.
- Amendment S-3097 to S-3082 filed, adopted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3082 filed.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/28/2019 11:30AM House Lounge.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Hinson and Donahue.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Celsi, and R. Smith.