+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 9:30AM House Lounge.
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Thompson, Bergan and Derry.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Thompson, Cohoon and Deyoe.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from Senate.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Amendment S-3068 filed, adopted.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2019 12:00PM House Lounge.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
- Subcommittee: Jeneary, Kacena and Wills.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Thompson, Derry and Moore, T..
- Introduced, referred to State Government.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Lofgren, Danielson, and Dawson.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor