+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (32)
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays 1.
- Senate concurred with S-3129.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3129.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 92, nays none.
- Amendment H-1217 adopted.
- Committee amendment H-1179 adopted.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1217 filed.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
- Committee amendment H-1179 filed.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Koester, Stanerson, and T. Taylor.
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
- Message from Senate.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 40, nays 9.
- Amendment S-3067 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3065 adopted.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3065 filed.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 3:00PM House Lounge
- Subcommittee Meeting: 1:30PM House Lounge
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- State Government: Wills Chair, Cohoon, Watts
- Recorded