+ − Transition
HSB156 is now SSB1122
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 91, nays none.
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 8:30AM House Lounge.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Gjerde and Nordman.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Ways and Means.
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 366.
- Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2021 11:30AM RM 111.
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Dawson, Dotzler, and Green.
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Gjerde and Nordman.
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.