+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 777.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 718.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 718.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 618.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 651.
- Withdrawn. H.J. 650.
- Substituted SF 347. H.J. 649.
- Amendment H-1192 adopted. H.J. 648.
- Amendments H-1085 and H-1183 withdrawn. H.J. 648.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Amendments H-1183 and H-1192 filed. H.J. 625.
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1085 filed. H.J. 556.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 497.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Human Resources.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Human Resources: Heaton Chair,Hess, and Stutsman.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor