+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Message from House, with amendment S-3190.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- SF 572 substituted.
- Amendment H-1226 adopted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 53 nays 43.
- Amendment H-1249B adopted.
- Amendment H-1249A adopted.
- Amendment H-1249 filed.
- Amendment H-1240 withdrawn.
- Substituted for HF 728.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1240 filed.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1226 filed.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/05/2019 3:45PM RM 315.
- Subcommittee: Miller-Meeks, Schultz, and T. Taylor.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2019 12:30PM House Lounge.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Jeneary, Kressig and Paustian.