+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Explanations of votes.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
- Substituted SF 125.
- Amendment H-1182 adopted.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays none.
- Substituted for HF 437.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1182 filed.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none.
- Amendment S-3061 adopted.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3061 filed.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 8:00AM House Lounge
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Commerce: Rizer Chair, Holt, Forbes
- Recorded
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.