+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Wills, Forbes and Mohr, G..
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Wills, Heddens and Mohr, G..
On January 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Amendment H-1210 filed.
- Amendment H-1198 filed.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2017 4:45PM House Lounge
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Wills, Mohr and Heddens.