+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President.
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 97, nays 0.
- House concurred in Senate amendment H-1312.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Senate amendment H-1312 filed.
- Message from Senate.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
- Amendment S-3291 filed, adopted.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Kraayenbrink, Allen, and Lofgren.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Local Government.
- Message from House.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 99, nays 0.
- Withdrawn.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Sheets, Deyoe and Nielsen.
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Local Government.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor