+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Secretary's report on correction in enrollment. S.J. 1045
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 91, nays 4.
- Withdrawn.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Rizer, Heaton, and Heddens.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to Appropriations.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment H-1178 filed.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee, Baltimore, Anderson, and Rogers.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 11:30AM House Lounge
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Human Resources: Forristall Chair, Wessel-Kroeschell, Rizer
- Recorded