+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays 0.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Cownie, Bacon and Oldson.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time, referred to State Government.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Explanation of vote.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3096 filed, adopted.
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0.
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Passed subcommittee.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 8:00AM House Lounge
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Cownie, Bacon and Oldson.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Anderson, Schneider, and Jochum.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2017 11:30AM Senate Lobbyist Lounge