+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On December 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor. S.J. 777.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Governor. S.J. 718.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 718.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Withdrawn. H.J. 514.
- Substituted SF 183. H.J. 513.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 379.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Commerce.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Brandenburg Chair,Dawson, and Fisher.
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor