+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn.
- HF 569 substituted.
- Amendment S-3218 filed, adopted.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 50, nays 0.
- Substituted for SF 426.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Attached to similar HF 569.
- Read first time and attached to similar SF 426.
- Message from House.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1089 adopted.
- Passed House, yeas 99 nays none.
- Explanation of vote.
- Immediate message.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment H-1089 filed.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal note.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2019 8:00AM House Lounge.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Lohse, Bergan and B. Meyer.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Chapman, Kinney and Nunn.