+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
- Rereferred to Judiciary.
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar under unfinished business.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time, passed on file.
- Message from Senate.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment S-3020 filed.
- Deferred.
- Amendment S-3025 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3026 to S-3020 filed, lost.
- Amendment S-3020 adopted.
- Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 17.
- Immediate message.
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report, approving bill.
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 3:00PM RM 116.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2019 12:00PM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Garrett, Chapman, Dawson, Hogg and Kinney.
- Subcommittee: Holt, Lohse and Oldson.