+ − Transition
HSB11 is now HF310
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Whiting, Bisignano, and Johnson.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary.
- Message from House.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Explanation of vote.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 94, nays none.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 310.
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/14/2021 12:30PM House Lounge.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/14/2021 12:30PM House Lounge.
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Klein and Wolfe.
- Introduced, referred to Judiciary.