+ − Transition
HSB102 is now HF521
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor.
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Message from Senate.
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Immediate message.
- Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0.
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee reassigned: Dickey, Brown, and T. Taylor.
- Subcommittee Meeting: 04/21/2021 12:00PM 217 Conference Room.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee: Brown, Dickey, and T. Taylor.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee recommends passage.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2021 8:30AM RM 24A.
- Subcommittee: Dickey, Giddens, and Klimesh.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Message from House.
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Withdrawn.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, referred to Transportation.
- Fiscal note.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Immediate message.
- Passed House, yeas 95, nays 1.
- Amendment H-1230 adopted.
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment H-1230 filed.
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Fiscal note.
- Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 828.
- Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 828.
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending amendment and passage.
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 8:30AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Maxwell, Nordman and Staed.
On February 15, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, referred to Ways and Means.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report, recommending passage.
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 1:00PM Law Library.
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee: Best, Kressig and Worthan.
- Introduced, referred to Transportation.