+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On December 31, 2013 in the House:
- * * * * * END OF 2013 ACTIONS * * * * *
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor. H.J. 703.
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor. H.J. 670.
- Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 670.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Message from Senate. H.J. 489.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Immediate message. S.J. 464.
- Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 1. S.J. 463.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 366.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Subcommittee, Hogg, Sodders, and Sorenson. S.J. 309.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Message from House. S.J. 268.
- Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 268.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Immediate message. H.J. 279.
- Explanation of vote. H.J. 279.
- Passed House, ayes 98, nays 1. H.J. 272.
- Amendment H-1002 adopted. H.J. 272.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment H-1002 filed. H.J. 171.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 166.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Voted - Judiciary.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Judiciary: Windschitl Chair,Alons, and Lensing.
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Date Recorded
+ − Sponsors (3)
Subcommittee assigned
Type:
Primary Sponsor