+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 428 (effective 7/1/09)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
On February 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2618ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Professional/Occupational/Administrative Process
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed 091787808
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2009: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2009: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor