+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0128)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 128 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar
- Reading of Governor's communication waived
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (89-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N)
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (SB174ER)
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 25, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB174ER)
On February 24, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 23, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to House
On February 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 986779701
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMM. R (40-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1998: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor