+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 654 (effective 3/21/19)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0654)
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1692ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Title replaced 19106765D-H1
- House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1692H1
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106765D-H1
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (94-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (94-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of House passage agreed to by House
- Passed House with substitute BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (95-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106765D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1692S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105767D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 19105767D-S1
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed with emergency clause 19104500D