+ − Summary
+ − Actions (13)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate
- Second reading: adopted Roll Call 222: yeas 90, nays 0
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators Bassler, Becker, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Busch, Charbonneau, Crane, Crider, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Grooms, Holdman, Houchin, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Melton, Merritt, Messmer, Mishler, Mrvan, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Ruckelshaus, Sandlin, Spartz, Stoops, Tallian, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker, Young M, Zay added as coauthors
- House sponsor: Representative Lehe
- Second reading: adopted standing vote
On January 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as third author
- Senator Alting added as second author
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
- Authored by Senator Buchanan