+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators Waterman and Paul added as coauthors
- Senator Delph added as coauthor
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator R. Young added as coauthor
- Senator Arnold added as coauthor
- Second reading: adopted voice vote
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Yoder added as coauthor
- Senator M. Young added as third author
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
- Authored by Senators Tomes and Waltz
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor