+ − Summary
+ − Actions (10)
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senator Holdman added as coauthor
- House sponsor: Rep. Bosma
- Referred to the House
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 203: yeas 32 and nays 18
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senators Hershman and Boots added as coauthors
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
- Authored by Senator Long
+ − Amendment
Senate Amendment 0018-1
Filed