+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: adopted Roll Call 173: yeas 91, nays 0
- Representative Fleming added as cosponsor
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Representative Engleman added as cosponsor
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: adopted standing vote
- House sponsor: Representative Lindauer
- Cosponsor: Representative Payne Z
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Senator Crane added as second author
- Senators Tomes, Crider, Boots added as coauthors
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Garten
- First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
+ − Vote
February 14, 2022: Roll Call 173
- Yeas: 91
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor