+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senators Melton and Taylor G added as coauthors
- House sponsor: Representative Bacon
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 99: yeas 30, nays 18
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Leising added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senators Becker and Charbonneau