+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 155
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 381: yeas 46, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 381: yeas 98, nays 0
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- House advisors appointed: Davisson, Soliday and Shackleford
- House conferees appointed: Zent and Brown C
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Sandlin, Ford and Mrvan
- Senate conferees appointed: Delph and Niezgodski
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 97, nays 0
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Representative Brown, C. added as cosponsor
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Walker added as coauthor
- Cosponsors: Representatives Frye and Burton
- House sponsor: Representative Zent
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 160: yeas 47, nays 1
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Amendment #6 (Delph) prevailed; voice vote
- Senators Kruse, Zakas, Alting added as coauthors
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Ford added as coauthor
- Senator Charbonneau added as third author
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senators Delph and Sandlin
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor