+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 95, nays 0
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Rhoads removed as cosponsor
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representatives Behning, Rhoads, Klinker added as cosponsors
- Representative Truitt added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 49, nays 0
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
- Authored by Senators Alting and Kenley
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor