+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Law 72
- Signed by the Governor
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments;
- Senator Taylor added as coauthor
- Senator Zakas added as coauthor
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading: passed;
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment #1 (Hale) prevailed;
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Representative Olthoff added as cosponsor
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators Bassler, Eckerty, Merritt added as coauthors
- Representatives Smaltz and Hale added as cosponsors
- Representative Cherry added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed;
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators Miller, Pat and Young, M. added as coauthors
- Senator Steele added as third author
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Arnold added as coauthor
- Senator Charbonneau added as second author
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senator Crider added as first author
- Senator Long removed as first author
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted, reassigned to Committee on
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading: referred to Committee on
- Authored by Senator Long
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor