+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 84
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 316: yeas 47, nays 1
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
On February 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 272: yeas 85, nays 2
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (Torr) prevailed; voice vote
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 46, nays 1
- House sponsor: Representative Torr
- Cosponsors: Representatives Behning, Speedy, Jeter C
- Senator Koch added as coauthor
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Walker K) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senators Walker K, Crider and Young M
- Coauthored by Senators Sandlin and Freeman
- First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
+ − Adopted Amendments (7)
+ − Proposed Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 64
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2022: Roll Call 272
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor