+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 52
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 230: yeas 93, nays 0
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 144: yeas 49, nays 0
- House sponsor: Representative Davis
- Cosponsors: Representatives Teshka J and Behning
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Leising added as coauthor
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as second author
- Senator Raatz added as third author
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Rogers
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 144
- Yeas: 49
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 230
- Yeas: 93