+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Law 54
- Signed by the Governor
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 350: yeas 48 and nays 1
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 314: yeas 91 and nays 0
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Second reading: engrossed.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Representative C. Brown added as cosponsor.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First Reading: Referred to Courts and Criminal Code
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 142: yeas 48 and nays 0
- Referred to the House
- Representative Bacon added as sponsor.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Becker added as third author.
- Senator Lanane added as second author.
- Second reading: engrossed
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amended do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reassigned to Public Policy, pursuant to rule 68(b)
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senator Alting added as first author.
- Senator Long removed as first author.
- Committee report: amended do pass, reassigned to Judiciary
On January 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First Reading: Referred to Rules and Legislative Procedure
- Authored by Senator Long
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor