+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 40
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 246: yeas 48, nays 0
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 183: yeas 93, nays 0
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Olthoff) prevailed; voice vote
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Representative Olthoff added as cosponsor
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Boehnlein added as coauthor
- Senator Zay added as coauthor
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 24: yeas 46, nays 1
- House sponsor: Representative Barrett
- Cosponsors: Representatives Ziemke and Fleming
- Senators Donato and Breaux added as coauthors
- Senator Pol added as coauthor
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote
- Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
- Senator Yoder added as coauthor
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as third author
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
- Senator Becker added as second author
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leising
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 183
- Yeas: 93
January 20, 2022: Roll Call 24
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor