+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- House sponsor: Representative Beck
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 35, nays 13
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Melton