+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 124
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 373: yeas 93, nays 0
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 354: yeas 39, nays 11
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Walker K removed as advisor
- Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee
- Senator Walker K added as conferee
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to dissent filed
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senate conferees appointed: Leising and Ford J.D.
- Senate advisors appointed: Walker K and Yoder
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Behning and DeLaney
- House advisors appointed: O'Brien, Prescott and Pfaff
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 294: yeas 94, nays 0
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (DeLaney) prevailed; voice vote
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 143: yeas 45, nays 4
- House sponsor: Representative Behning
- Cosponsors: Representatives O'Brien T and Prescott
- Senator Becker added as coauthor
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #1 (Leising) prevailed; voice vote
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Walker K added as second author
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leising
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
+ − Proposed Amendments (21)
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 143
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 4
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 294
- Yeas: 94