+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor
- Public Law 51
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 331: yeas 45, nays 1
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 89, nays 5
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #2 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Melton added as coauthor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 142: yeas 30, nays 19
- House sponsor: Representative Behning
- Cosponsor: Representative Davis M
- Senator Becker added as coauthor
- Senator Pol added as coauthor
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
- Senator Donato added as second author
- Senator Kruse added as third author
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Authored by Senator Leising
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 142
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 19
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 295
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 5