+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Law 46
- Signed by the Governor
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate without amendments
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 282: yeas 96, nays 0
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Representative Macer added as cosponsor
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Carbaugh and Heaton
- House sponsor: Representative Ober
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 50, nays 0
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Merritt added as second author
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Lanane added as coauthor
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
- Authored by Senator Ford
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor