+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Garten added as third author
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 47, nays 1
- House sponsor: Representative Frye R
- Cosponsor: Representative Bacon
- Senator Charbonneau added as second author
- Senators Crider, Boots, Ruckelshaus, Young M added as coauthors
- Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
- Senators Freeman, Alting, Rogers added as coauthors
- Senator Lanane added as coauthor
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Senator Sandlin added as coauthor
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau removed as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
- Authored by Senator Tomes