+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Manning and Miller
- House sponsor: Representative Torr
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: yeas 49, nays 1
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Koch added as third author
- Amendment #2 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senator Rogers added as second author
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Authored by Senator Doriot