+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Lucas and Morris
- House sponsor: Representative Smaltz
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 141: yeas 42, nays 6
On January 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Amendment #1 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Pol added as coauthor
- Senator Taylor G added as third author
- Senator Ford Jon added as second author
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
- Authored by Senator Young M
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Vote
February 1, 2022: Roll Call 141
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 6