+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 447: yeas 97, nays 0
- CCR # 1 filed in the House
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
- Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 407: yeas 50, nays 0
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Hershman and Broden
- Motion to dissent filed
- Senate dissented from House amendments
- Senate Advisors appointed: Yoder, Mrvan and Kenley
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees appointed: Brown T and Porter
- House Advisors appointed: Soliday, Huston, Forestal, Goodin, Riecken and Pryor
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 362: yeas 93, nays 0
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Riecken added as cosponsor
- Representative Smith, M. added as cosponsor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Buck added as coauthor
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Representative Soliday added as cosponsor
- Senator Perfect added as coauthor
- Representative Brown, T. added as sponsor
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 17: yeas 49, nays 1
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendment #1 (Hershman) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as coauthor
On January 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senators Bassler, Becker, Boots, Crider, Eckerty, Grooms, Head, Holdman, Houchin, Kruse, Leising, Merritt, Messmer, Miller, Pat, Mishler, Raatz, Smith, Steele, Walker, Young, M., Zakas added as coauthors
- Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor
- Senator Yoder added as third author
- Senator Kenley added as second author
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Hershman
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor