+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Law 154
- Signed by the Governor
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 397: yeas 41, nays 8
- Senator Zakas added as coauthor
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
- Dissent rescinded
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate dissented from House amendments
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Wesco and Errington
- House advisors appointed: Lehman, Thompson, Wolkins and Smith V
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate advisors appointed: Doriot, Melton, Young M, Raatz, Crane and Walker
- Senate conferees appointed: Kruse and Stoops
- Motion to dissent filed
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 266: yeas 70, nays 26
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment #7 (Clere) failed; Division of the House: yeas 41, nays 50
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
- Amendment #11 (Wesco) prevailed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Pelath) ruled out of order
- Amendment #6 (Clere) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #8 (Nisly) failed; voice vote
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
- Senator Merritt added as coauthor
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Wesco
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 97: yeas 37, nays 12
- Cosponsors: Representatives Thompson, Burton and DeVon
- Senator Ford added as coauthor
- Senators Brown L, Buck, Eckerty, Grooms, Holdman, Koch, Niemeyer, Smith J, Sandlin, Crider added as coauthors
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Zay and Delph added as coauthors
- Amendment #2 (Breaux) failed; Roll Call 75: yeas 9, nays 40
- Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 74: yeas 8, nays 41
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senator Bassler added as coauthor
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Houchin and Freeman added as coauthors
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senators Raatz, Tomes, Crane added as coauthors
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
- Authored by Senators Kruse, Doriot and Young M
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor