+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- House sponsor: Representative Ziemke
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 177: yeas 49, nays 0
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Breaux added as coauthor
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Mrvan added as coauthor
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Merritt added as third author
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Kruse added as coauthor
- Senator Raatz added as second author
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
- Authored by Senator Head