+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Law 21
- Signed by the Governor
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President Pro Tempore
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 325: yeas 28, nays 16
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to concur filed
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Returned to the Senate with amendments
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 320: yeas 63, nays 31
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #4 (Kersey) failed; Roll Call 283: yeas 26, nays 67
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Ober added as cosponsor
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 33, nays 17
- House sponsor: Representative Richardson
- Cosponsor: Representative Smith, M.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Miller, Pete added as coauthor
- Senator Head added as second author
- Amendment #5 (Taylor) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #4 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
- Amendment #1 (Miller Pete) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senator Walker added as author
- Senator Long removed as author
- Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Elections
On January 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure
- Authored by Senator Long
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor