+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Representative Klinker added as cosponsor
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Cosponsors: Representatives Negele and Brown, T.
- House sponsor: Representative Lehe
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 48, nays 1
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading: ordered engrossed
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass, adopted
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Authored by Senators Buchanan and Alting