+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to the House
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Cosponsor: Representative Leonard
- House sponsor: Representative Sullivan
- Third reading: passed; Roll Call 175: yeas 49, nays 0
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendment #2 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote
- Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Randolph added as coauthor
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senator Zay added as second author
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
- Authored by Senator Holdman
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor